U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bordeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Sealed Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 05, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Witness List]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 23, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sealed Evaluation]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Psychiatric Report Received]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 09, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 02, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 02, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Exhibit List]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 30, 2020: [Witness List]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Brief]
  • August 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2020: [Competency Report]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Sealed Order]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Status Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Competency Report]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • April 02, 2019: [Competency Evaluation]
  • April 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2018: [Request]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2018: [Request]
  • April 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2018: [Request]
  • April 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.