U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 26, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 15, 2018: [Request]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.