U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Hat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 25, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 21, 2018: [Release from Custody]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extend]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2018: [Request]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2018: [Request]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.