U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ladeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 27, 2025: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 10, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 26, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 26, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 30, 2021: [Response]
  • November 29, 2021: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2018: [Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 30, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 22, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Request]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.