U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oakie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 11, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 12, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 08, 2020: [Response]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 29, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 22, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 17, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 16, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 06, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Verdict]
  • September 05, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 05, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • September 05, 2019: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 04, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 04, 2019: [Jury List]
  • September 04, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 03, 2019: [Witness List]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [For Order]
  • August 30, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 27, 2019: [Jury List]
  • August 27, 2019: [Response]
  • August 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 19, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Furlough]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 15, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 02, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 01, 2018: [Furlough]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 25, 2018: [Request]
  • May 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2018: [Request]
  • May 24, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.