U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steele
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 14, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2018: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 26, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • September 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • September 20, 2018: [Jury List]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2018: [Request]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.