U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burning Breast
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Request]
  • April 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.