U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zephier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extend]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extend]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 22, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 22, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • November 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2022: [Admission]
  • November 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 28, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Supplement]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Response]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extend]
  • August 05, 2022: [Delivered]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response]
  • June 09, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 02, 2022: [Affidavit]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 31, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 31, 2022: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 27, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [In Limine]
  • May 24, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 12, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2021: [Consent]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • March 25, 2021: [Transport Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • October 10, 2019: [Request]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 24, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 20, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 20, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 20, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 09, 2019: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • September 03, 2019: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 10, 2019: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 17, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 21, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 05, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Verdict]
  • March 05, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • March 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 05, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 05, 2019: [Jury List]
  • March 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 27, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 27, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 26, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 26, 2019: [Exclude]
  • February 26, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 26, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 25, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 12, 2018: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 30, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 30, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Suppress]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 30, 2018: [Discovery]
  • March 30, 2018: [Response]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2018: [Request]
  • March 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.