U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crespin-Guardado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 26, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 14, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.