U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fobb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 11, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • January 07, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 17, 2018: [Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response]
  • March 27, 2018: [Request]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.