U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoefert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 03, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 22, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 21, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 20, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 15, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Produce ]
  • August 14, 2018: [Bill of Particulars]
  • August 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2018: [Jury List]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 10, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 08, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 07, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 07, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Produce]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Produce ]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 14, 2018: [Discovery]
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 27, 2018: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 21, 2018: [Quash]
  • March 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.