U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rabbit
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • October 16, 2018: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • October 16, 2018: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2018: [Request]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.