U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paul et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 23, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 22, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 25, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 24, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • August 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 18, 2020: [Response]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 05, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 04, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 04, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 03, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 20, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 04, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 28, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 18, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 14, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 14, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 17, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 30, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 30, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 29, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 28, 2018: [Response]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2018: [Joinder]
  • August 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Suppress]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 25, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Request]
  • March 28, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 27, 2018: [Request]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2018: [Request]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.