U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04004
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Brandstrom
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 09, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 07, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • June 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 04, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Returned Mail]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 22, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • May 02, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • April 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Intervene]
  • April 19, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Intervene]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.