U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. West
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 03, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • October 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 25, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 25, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • October 25, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • October 25, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 25, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 24, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 24, 2018: [Jury List]
  • October 17, 2018: [Trial Brief ]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 03, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 02, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 26, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 20, 2018: [Request]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 16, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • March 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.