U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40117
  • Case Name: Heather Suzanne Corcoran
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.