U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50065
  • Case Name: Jeremy Allen Nye
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.