U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nettifee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Objection]
  • September 25, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Request]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 09, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 28, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 20, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.