U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grap
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 14, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 14, 2020: [Release from Custody]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Request]
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Order]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.