U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ogden et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 08, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • September 14, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 16, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 16, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 01, 2019: [Joinder]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 28, 2018: [Joinder]
  • June 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 18, 2018: [Joinder]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 09, 2018: [Request]
  • April 06, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Request]
  • March 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 26, 2018: [Request]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 22, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.