U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 21, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 29, 2019: [Certificate]
  • January 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 23, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 11, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • December 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 05, 2018: [Furlough]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [In Limine]
  • June 01, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Request]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arrest]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.