U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Request]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 23, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 15, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 24, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 18, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 08, 2018: [Furlough]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Request]
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2018: [Request]
  • March 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.