U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oien
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Forfeiture]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 20, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • September 17, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 10, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 23, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 22, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 20, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 14, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2020: [Evaluation]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 21, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 27, 2018: [Request]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.