U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 03, 2018: [Discovery]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response]
  • March 28, 2018: [Request]
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.