U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Geib
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Request]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 20, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.