U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monzon-Perla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 03, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 21, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 21, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.