U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04031
  • Case Name: Rumzis v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Letter Sent]
  • March 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 18, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 18, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 18, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 05, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Reverse]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 30, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
  • May 30, 2018: [Briefing Schedule]
  • May 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 21, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 21, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 21, 2018: [Complaint - Social Security Appeal (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.