U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McIlravy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 26, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 14, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 07, 2018: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 05, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 28, 2018: [Response]
  • June 27, 2018: [Furlough]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • April 03, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 21, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 21, 2018: [Seal Case]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.