U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandersfeld et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Response]
  • October 19, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response]
  • October 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 21, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 19, 2020: [Response]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 12, 2020: [Supplement]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 11, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 08, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Release from Custody]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 30, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 07, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 05, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 28, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 31, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 25, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Discovery]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2018: [Request]
  • March 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.