U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Widow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 27, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.