U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04033
  • Case Name: Williams Development & Construction, Inc. et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 27, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 27, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 13, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Withdraw]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Declaration]
  • March 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 23, 2020: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 23, 2020: [Declaration]
  • March 23, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Declaration]
  • November 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 06, 2019: [Quash]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Form 52 Report]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Letter Sent]
  • May 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Response]
  • September 13, 2018: [Reply]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Request]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 23, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 23, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 01, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 16, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 16, 2018: [Consent]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 06, 2018: [Return of Service Executed]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 26, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 26, 2018: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.