U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10032
  • Case Name: Shirley Anne Goff
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.