U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 09, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2019: [Competency Report]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 14, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • September 04, 2018: [Subpoena Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 04, 2018: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Response]
  • July 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2018: [Request]
  • April 02, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2018: [Request]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 29, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.