U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40134
  • Case Name: Damian John Lonsdale and Amber Erin Lonsdale
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
March, 2021
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver of notice) (fee required)]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Returned Mail]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • July 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Party]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.