U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 10-40728
  • Case Name: Jack Lynn Wilson and Patricia Kay Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certification of Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.