U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Esteves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 01, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 24, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 22, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Response]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2018: [Request]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.