U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khaoon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 13, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 26, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • July 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2021: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Request for Warrant]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • April 30, 2019: [Declaration of Publication]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2018: [Forfeiture]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 31, 2018: [Discovery]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2018: [Request]
  • June 15, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 04, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.