U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 16, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 29, 2018: [Discovery]
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 15, 2018: [Request]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • June 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.