U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Tovar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Response]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2018: [Request]
  • April 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.