U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40159
  • Case Name: Timothy Ryan Kaubisch and Cheryl Lorraine Kaubisch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.