U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40160
  • Case Name: Dean Alan Seegers and Joy Alice Seegers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Venue Change]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.