U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10036
  • Case Name: David Brian Bieber and Patricia Moorman Bieber
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.