U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04006
  • Case Name: Lair v. Stevenson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Case]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Brief]
  • October 11, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Affidavit]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 09, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
May, 2018
  • May 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • May 18, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • May 14, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.