U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2021: [Transcript]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 23, 2020: [Forfeiture]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 17, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 26, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • November 14, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 13, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 13, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 23, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 23, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • July 26, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • July 26, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Verdict]
  • July 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 26, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 25, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 23, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2018: [Exclude]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 02, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Reply]
  • June 29, 2018: [Jury List]
  • June 29, 2018: [Voir Dire Began]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Objection]
  • June 25, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 21, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2018: [In Limine]
  • June 21, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 08, 2018: [Request]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 30, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.