U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills Right
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • December 02, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Transport Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Request for Warrant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 10, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • July 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.