U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Old Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 08, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 17, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 29, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Request]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.