U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. May
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Request]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2018: [Request]
  • April 30, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.