U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quigley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 29, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 29, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 29, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2018: [Request]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.