U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Youngman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sealed Evaluation]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 20, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.