U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Evaluation]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Furlough]
  • March 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 24, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2018: [Request]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2018: [Arrest]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.